skip to content

Kiehn, Lana

CPSO#: 89203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

22 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4512 Ext. 74311
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3-17150 Yonge St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8V3
Canada
Phone: 1-800-361-5653
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lana Kiehn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kiehn ( CPSO# 89203 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Business Address:
22 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4512

Business Address:
3-17150 Yonge St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8V3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LANA KIEHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIEHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2010 to 28 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011