skip to content

Kidy, Abdul Razak

CPSO#: 28794

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kidy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Prism Eye Institute 605-7700 Hurontario St Brampton ON L6Y 4M3
Date Received: 06 May 2019


Address: Manager Prism Eye Institute 7700 Hurontario St Brampton ON L6Y 4M3 Phone: 905-456-3937 Fax: 905-459-5085
Date Received: 02 Apr 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019