skip to content

Kidanewold, Wondwossen Hailu

CPSO#: 88988

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530 6000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W.H. Kidanewold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kidanewold ( CPSO# 88988 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WONDWOSSEN HAILU KIDANEWOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIDANEWOLD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013