skip to content

Kianfar, Mehry Jennifer

CPSO#: 93701

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0G9
Phone: (905) 451-1806 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mehry Kianfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kianfar ( CPSO# 93701 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0G9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHRY JENNIFER KIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIANFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2013