skip to content

Khzam, Mohamed Omar S

CPSO#: 85970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
PO Box 2100
St John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6539

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Khzam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khzam ( CPSO# 85970 )

Business Address:
620 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 277-1222

Business Address:
Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
St John NB  E2L 4L2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:29 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED OMAR S KHZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHZAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 10 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 11 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016