skip to content

Khurshid, Faiza

CPSO#: 89657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Watkins 3
Room 4 3 218
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3729 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Faiza Khurshid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khurshid ( CPSO# 89657 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 583-6232


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Sep 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:12 Sep 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019 Active
             Dr.  Faiza  Khurshid  may  practise  medicine  independently  in pediatrics and
            neonatal-perinatal medicine.