skip to content

Khurana, Mona

CPSO#: 88672

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Humber River Regional Hospital, 2111 Finch Avenue West, North York, ON M3N 1N1
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015