skip to content

Khosravani, Houman

CPSO#: 93444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 89124
Fax: (647) 800-6745 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

SouthLake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6626
Fax: 647-800-6745
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-742-3611
Fax: 647-800-6745
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Houman Khosravani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perri ( CPSO# 77712 )
Dr. H. Khosravani ( CPSO# 93444 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room A402
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary`s Hospital
911 Queen Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOUMAN KHOSRAVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSRAVANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015