skip to content

Khomani, Abderrahim

CPSO#: 97292

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Russian

Education:St Petersburg State Pediatric Medical AC, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gibbs Cancer Center & Research Inst
380 Serpentine Dr
Spartanburg SC  29303
United States
Phone: (864) 560-7050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:15 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014 Active
 Dr. Abderrahim Khomani may practise medicine independently in medical oncology,
            only.