skip to content

Kholdebarin, Ramin

CPSO#: 99375

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2012 to 17 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2014 to 02 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2016