skip to content

Khokhotva, Mykola

CPSO#: 88819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-8240
Fax: (613) 354-8241 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-4154
Fax: (519) 254-4158
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Naoum and M. Khokhotva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khokhotva ( CPSO# 88819 )
Dr. S. Naoum ( CPSO# 90621 )

Business Address:
101 - 200 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview ON  K7N 0B6
Phone Number: (613) 389-1604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MYKOLA KHOKHOTVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOKHOTVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013