skip to content

Khoja, Murtuza Hyder

CPSO#: 85839

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pulse Urgent Care (Dusk)
55 Dusk Drive
Unit 1
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: (905) 456-8998 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1366 Yonge Street
suite 208
Toronto ON  M4T3A7
Canada
Phone: 4169239695
Fax: 4169238261
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Pulse Urgent Care (Bramalea)
11755 Bramalea road
Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6R3S9
Canada
Phone: 2898018999
Fax: 9057913553
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Murtuza H. Khoja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khoja ( CPSO# 85839 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1

Business Address:
Unit 4
11755 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3S9

Business Address:
Unit 1
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone Number: (905) 451-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURTUZA HYDER KHOJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jan 2007 to 02 Feb 2007
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007