skip to content

Khimdas, Sarit Subhash

CPSO#: 98060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3460 Schmonn Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V4Y6
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarit Khimdas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khimdas ( CPSO# 98060 )

Business Address:
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 684-8521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARIT SUBHASH KHIMDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHIMDAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017