skip to content

Kherani, Tamizan

CPSO#: 91684

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015