Khemlin, Alexander (CPSO#: 96894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2310
Fax: 905-530-1830
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khemlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khemlin ( CPSO# 96894 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER KHEMLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHEMLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013