skip to content

Khawar, Muhammad Khalid

CPSO#: 65808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scott Street Medical Clinic
A2C - 387 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W2
Phone: (905) 646-8383
Fax: (905) 646-0202 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD KHALID KHAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2021