skip to content

Khatiwada, Bikalpa

CPSO#: 87769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Nepali

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bikalpa Khatiwada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khatiwada ( CPSO# 87769 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BIKALPA KHATIWADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATIWADA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009