skip to content

Khatib, Aisha Nazir

CPSO#: 91770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IWHC Toronto
#200
489 College St
Toronto ON  M6G 1A5
Phone: (416) 323-9986 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Centre at 80 Bond
St. Michael's Hospital
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Canada
Phone: 416-864-3011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AISHA NAZIR KHATIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
CF - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016