skip to content

Khasimuddin, Syed Ameen

CPSO#: 97462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57337 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:25 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active
 Dr.  Syed  Ameen  Khasimuddin  may  practise  medicine independently as a
                  hospitalist, only.