skip to content

Kharonsky, Rita Michailovna

CPSO#: 90032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Lithuanian, Russian

Education:Kaunas State University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 007
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: (905) 884-7482
Fax: (905) 884-7483 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kharonsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kharonsky ( CPSO# 90032 )

Business Address:
7 - 10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 884-7482

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RITA MICHAILOVNA KHARONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARONSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009