skip to content

Khanna, Rahul

CPSO#: 86211

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Max Care Medical Centre
Unit 3
2165 Grosvenor Street
Oakville ON  L6H 7K9
Phone: (905) 338-3107
Fax: (905) 338-6400 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1
611 Wanless Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 3Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 840-2008
Fax: (905) 840-2002
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rahul Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khanna ( CPSO# 86211 )

Business Address:
Medica One Clinic
2165 Grosvenor Street
Oakville ON  L6H 5K9
Phone Number: (647) 969-3439

Business Address:
611 Wanless Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 3Y6
Phone Number: (906) 840-2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAHUL KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 22 Jun 2007
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009