skip to content

Khanna, Anuradha

CPSO#: 91899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:Shivaji University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Doctor's Clinic
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Phone: (416) 266-6600
Fax: (416) 266-6604 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1870 Altona Rd
Unit B
Pickering ON  L1V 0E4
Canada
Phone: 9054923100
Fax: 9054923140
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.Anuradha Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khanna ( CPSO# 91899 )

Business Address:
Markham-Kingston Medical centre
3545 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON  M1M R6
Phone Number: 4162666600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANURADHA KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011