skip to content

Khandelwal, Surbhi

CPSO#: 94170

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khandelwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 74451 )
Dr. S. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 94170 )

Business Address:
Suite C
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 735-8131

Business Address:
Renal Clinic
Third Floor
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 376-4647

Business Address:
C-165 Plymouth Rd
Welland ON  L3B 3E1


Corporation Name: Surbhi Khandelwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 74451 )
Dr. S. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 94170 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SURBHI KHANDELWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANDELWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 06 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012