skip to content

Khandaker, Masud Hassan

CPSO#: 97619

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
3rd Floor, Cardiology
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-863-2558
Fax: 905-863-2495 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Masud Khandaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shafi ( CPSO# 91702 )
Dr. M. Khandaker ( CPSO# 97619 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
3rd Floor, Cardiology
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 863-2558

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
William Olser Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8


Corporation Name: Sharmi Shafi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shafi ( CPSO# 91702 )
Dr. M. Khandaker ( CPSO# 97619 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2465

Business Address:
Unit 143-144
3227 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 447-7394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective:01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2014 Active
 Dr.  Masud  Hassan  Khandaker  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  internal medicine and cardiology, only.