skip to content

Khanda, Gul-e

CPSO#: 94568

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2010 to 19 Dec 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016