skip to content

Khan, Zanobia Fayyaz

CPSO#: 93339

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pathology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: 9055768711 Ext. 34531 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zanobia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Khan ( CPSO# 93339 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZANOBIA FAYYAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Dec 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016