skip to content

Khan, Yasir H

CPSO#: 93320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carea Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Phone: (905) 723-0036 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Durham College
Campus Health Centre
2000 Simcoe Street, N.
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-3037
Fax: (905) 721-3133
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yasir H. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan ( CPSO# 93320 )

Business Address:
Durham College Campus Health Centre
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L7
Phone Number: (905) 721-3038

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASIR H KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015