skip to content

Khan, Shahzia Tariq

CPSO#: 94511

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
905 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2M6
Phone: (519) 433-6137
Fax: (519) 433-6527 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1210 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1B4
Canada
Phone: (519) 686-0484
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahzia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 94511 )

Business Address:
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Business Address:
905 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y M6
Phone Number: 5194336137

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHZIA TARIQ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012