skip to content

Khan, Seema Natasha

CPSO#: 87392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Allergy Associates
595 Montreal Road, Suite 307
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 422-5055
Fax: (613) 422-5056 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Seema Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 87392 )

Business Address:
307 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 422-5055

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:06 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010 Active
 1.    Dr.  Seema  Natasha  Khan may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine and clinical immunology and allergy, only.