skip to content

Khan, Saima Waheed

CPSO#: 89963

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MAVIS MEDIX
780 Burnhamthorpe Road West, Unit 4
Mississauga ON  L5C 3X3
Phone: (905) 277 5454
Fax: (905) 277-1818 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

JACOBS PAIN CENTRE
8920 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Canada
Phone: 905-3059484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

PAINLESS MEDICINE & THERAPUTICS
55 York Street, Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5J 1R7
Canada
Phone: (647) 353-2862
Fax: (647) 352-2672
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Saima W. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 89963 )

Business Address:
Terry Fox Medical
10 - 5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 858-3030

Business Address:
The Jacob Pain Center
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAIMA WAHEED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 28 Nov 2009 to 28 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010