skip to content

Khan, Nayla Mehboob

CPSO#: 85034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
2260 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J5
Phone: (905) 497-9002
Fax: (905) 497-0902 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nayla Mehboob Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khan ( CPSO# 85034 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Care System
Brampton Civic Hospital
418-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 497-9002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAYLA MEHBOOB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012