skip to content

Khan, Mujtaba Ahmed

CPSO#: 89561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 3T7
Phone: (905) 450-2981
Fax: (905) 450-2532 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2017
Corporation Name: Farhana Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981


Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )

Business Address:
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 Mar 2021 Active
 
As from March 5, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mujtaba Ahmed Khan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. MUJTABA AHMED KHAN
("Dr. Khan")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Khan, certificate of registration number 89561, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1113794 (the "Investigation") into whether I engage in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Khan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective 	immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Khan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module, CMPA: www.cmpa-acpm.ca/serve/elearning/documentation/en/index.html
 
(ii)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:          
  
1.	McConaghy JR, Sharma M, Patel H. Acute chest pain in adults: outpatient evaluation. Am Fam Physician 2020;102(12):721-727. www.aafp.org/afp/2020/1215/p721.html
2.	Mercado MG, Smith DK, Guard EL. Acute kidney injury: diagnosis and management. Am Fam Physician 2019;100(11):687-694. www.aafp.org/afp/2019/1201/p687.html
3.	Medical Records Documentation, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records-Documentation

(b)	I, Dr. Khan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Khan, undertake to complete this requirement within three months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(6)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(7)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of 	all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the 	provisions of this Undertaking. 

(8)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(9)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(10)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may 	constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(11)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(12)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Khan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Khan will engage in professional education in Chest Pain, Kidney Injury and Medical Record Keeping.  

(c)	I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(13)	I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with 	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with 	this Undertaking.

(14)	I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of 	the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 5, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mujtaba Ahmed Khan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 5, 2021:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Khan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine.
As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Khan will engage in professional education in Chest Pain, Kidney Injury and Medical Record Keeping.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 14, 2019, Dr. Mujtaba Ahmed Khan has completed all components of his SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)