skip to content

Khan, Mohammed Moin

CPSO#: 93938

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Mary Grace Wing, Room G826
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 32953
Fax: 9053087218 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moin Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 93938 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Mary Grace Wing, Room G826
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:14 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED MOIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015