skip to content

Khan, Mohammed Abdul Wahab

CPSO#: 97687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 302
345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: (905) 842-5316 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-311 McArthur Ave
Vanier ON  K1L 8M3
Canada
Phone: (613) 749-1678
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1910 St Laurent Blvd #18
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 523-5550
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Wahab Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 97687 )

Business Address:
18-1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 523-5550

Business Address:
103-311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL WAHAB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017