skip to content

Khan, Mohamed Abdul Rauf

CPSO#: 28457

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
12 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Jabalpur University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rauf Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2021