skip to content

Khan, Mateen Abdul-Rahman

CPSO#: 96780

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Temple University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014