skip to content

Khan, Mahmuda Begum

CPSO#: 30040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Nairobi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markington Family Practice and Walk
143-3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 3M5
Phone: 416 261 4446
Fax: 416 261 4447 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cliffwood Family Practice and Walk
3891 Don Mills Rd
North York ON  M2H 2S7
Canada
Phone: 647 532 7572
Fax: 416 493 0707
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mahmuda Begum Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 30040 )

Business Address:
116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto ON  M4E 2X2
Phone Number: (416) 698-0999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHMUDA BEGUM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019