skip to content

Khan, James Shiraz

CPSO#: 95509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Khan ( CPSO# 95509 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
19th Floor, Room 19 - 104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
366 Bay Street
10th Floor
Toronto ON  M5H 4B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES SHIRAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Mar 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018