skip to content

Khan, Farrukh Abbas

CPSO#: 90176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-5426
Fax: (416) 281-3600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 90176 )

Business Address:
319 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-5426

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7375

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:27 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARRUKH ABBAS KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009