skip to content

Khan, Farhana Ahmed

CPSO#: 89243

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 3T7
Phone: (905) 450-2981
Fax: (905) 450-2532 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farhana Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2015
Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )

Business Address:
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981


Corporation Name: Farhana Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )

Business Address:
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARHANA AHMED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009