skip to content

Khan, Farah Yaqoob

CPSO#: 94069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
9581 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3A5
Phone: (905) 417-5777
Fax: (905) 417-5774 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farah Y. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 94069 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
9581 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3A5
Phone Number: (905) 417-5777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARAH YAQOOB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011