skip to content

Khan, Asif Ali

CPSO#: 91842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Asif Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASIF ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018