skip to content

Khan, Airudin Sulaiman

CPSO#: 23146

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jan 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: If you wish to request a copy of your chart, please contact RSRS Inc. directly using the following information: On the internet: https://www.recordsolutions.ca/getmymedrecord/ Via telephone (if urgent): 1-888-563-3732, Ext. 1 Via fax: 1-877-398-5932 Or via letter mail: 111 St. Regis Crescent S., Toronto, ON. M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 11 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2022

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)