skip to content

Khambhla, Arvind Dharamshi

CPSO#: 23781

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education: Gujarat University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arvind D. Khambhla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2021

Medical Records Location

Instructions: : Patients who are seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Management Ltd. at 1 800-775-0093
Date Received: 16 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021