skip to content

Khambalia, Bashir

CPSO#: 24902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Swahili

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H8
Phone: (905) 662-2501
Fax: (905) 662-4100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bashir Khambalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khambalia ( CPSO# 24902 )

Business Address:
72 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H8
Phone Number: (905) 662-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASHIR KHAMBALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMBALIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1972