skip to content

Khalil, Waill Yousry Ibrahim Hassan

CPSO#: 91883

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
5-521 Hwy 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G4
Phone: 905-662-2775
Fax: 905-662-7775 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:05 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WAILL YOUSRY IBRAHIM HASSAN KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 21 Jul 2009 to 06 Nov 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2019