skip to content

Khalil, Raghad

CPSO#: 84892

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khalil ( CPSO# 84892 )

Business Address:
318 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (416) 356-4317

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAGHAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012