skip to content

Khachatryan, Davit

CPSO#: 97653

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905)-576-8711 Ext. 2206 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Khachatryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Khachatryan ( CPSO# 97653 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 550-3313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:28 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVIT KHACHATRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHACHATRYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017