skip to content

Keyzer, Johannes Jan

CPSO#: 19543

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 1-Sep-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Leiden, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006