skip to content

Leonard, Kevin Christopher

CPSO#: 90506

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone: (613) 342-9756
Fax: (613) 342-1119 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V1S8
Canada
Phone: 6133455645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Perth & Smiths Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A2H9
Canada
Phone: 6132832330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kevin C. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leonard ( CPSO# 90506 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
Suite 108
309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone Number: (613) 342-9756

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014